There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Osteoporosis Early Detection and Prevention Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act and Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to require that group and individual health insurance coverage and group health plans provide coverage for qualified individuals for bone mass measurement (bone density testing) to prevent fractures associated with osteoporosis and to help women make informed choices about their reproductive and post-menopausal health care.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/22/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
11/09/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
11/07/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/22/1997Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/22/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/29/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/06/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/27/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/09/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce10/22/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment11/09/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce10/22/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations11/07/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2693.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2693. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/22/1997)

Osteoporosis Early Detection and Prevention Act of 1997 - Amends the Public Health Service Act and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to require a group health plan, and an insurer offering group coverage, to include coverage for bone mass measurement for individuals who: (1) are estrogen-deficient women at clinical risk for osteoporosis; (2) have vertebral abnormalities; (3) are receiving chemotherapy or long-term gluococorticoid (steroid) therapy; (4) have primary hyperparathyroidism, hyperthyroidism, or excess thyroid replacement; or (5) are being monitored to assess the response to or efficacy of approved osteoporosis drug therapy. Regulates frequency and cost sharing. Prohibits related denial of coverage, incentives to individuals, restrictions on provider-patient communications, and provider penalties. Allows State laws providing greater detection or prevention benefits. Amends the Public Health Service Act to apply the above requirements to coverage offered in the individual market.