Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/22/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/29/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/06/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/27/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/09/1998