Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/22/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/23/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/30/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/30/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/30/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/12/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/26/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/13/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/09/1998