Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/03/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/03/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/03/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/03/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/11/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/11/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/19/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/19/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/28/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/07/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/07/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/18/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/14/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/03/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 08/03/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 08/03/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/23/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/23/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/23/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/10/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/10/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/20/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/17/1998