Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 10/24/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/29/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/29/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/29/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/30/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/12/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/27/1998