Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/03/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/03/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/03/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/03/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/03/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/11/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/11/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/11/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/12/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/04/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/23/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/23/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/30/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/30/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/30/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/30/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 04/30/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/30/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/18/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/18/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/18/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/11/1998