Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/28/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/28/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/28/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/28/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/07/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/24/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/04/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/17/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/17/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/21/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/11/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/11/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/25/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/14/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/18/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/25/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/02/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/02/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/07/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/13/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/1998