Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/29/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/29/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/25/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/25/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/25/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/19/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/19/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/19/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/19/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/19/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/19/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/19/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/22/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/22/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/22/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/22/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/22/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 08/07/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/07/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 08/07/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/20/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/20/1998