Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/29/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/29/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/31/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/04/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/05/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/05/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/05/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/27/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/12/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/25/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/12/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/31/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/05/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/18/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/18/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/18/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/20/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/14/1998