Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 10/30/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/13/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/04/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/12/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/19/1998