Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 10/31/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 10/31/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/31/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 10/31/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/19/1998