Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/31/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/31/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/27/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/27/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/27/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/25/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/15/1998