Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/11/1998
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/11/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/11/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/26/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/26/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/11/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/12/1998