Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/05/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/05/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/06/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/06/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/06/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 11/06/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/06/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/06/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/07/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/07/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/07/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/07/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/09/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/13/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/13/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/03/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/03/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/11/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/05/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/19/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/24/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/27/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/07/1998