Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/06/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 11/06/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/28/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/30/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/30/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/30/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 01/30/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/30/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/30/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/30/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/30/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 01/30/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/30/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/30/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/30/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/30/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/30/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/30/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 01/30/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/30/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/30/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/30/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/30/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/30/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/30/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/30/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 01/30/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/30/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/30/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/30/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/30/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/30/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 01/30/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/30/1998