Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/19/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/19/1998