Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/17/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/14/1998