Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/03/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/05/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/12/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/04/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/04/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/12/1998