Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/07/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/07/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/05/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/22/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/22/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998