Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/29/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/16/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/17/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/17/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/28/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/13/1998