Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/04/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/27/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/07/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/07/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/07/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/12/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/12/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/12/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/12/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/21/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/03/1998