Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/05/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/05/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/05/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/05/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/24/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/10/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/26/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/26/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/01/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/07/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/07/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/07/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/07/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/13/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/10/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/10/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/23/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/09/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/14/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/24/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/24/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/09/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew