Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/07/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/08/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/27/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/04/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/05/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/24/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/17/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/17/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/11/1998