Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/03/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/05/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/29/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/05/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/05/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/11/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/17/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/17/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/25/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/01/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/13/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/20/1998