Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/21/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/21/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/21/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/10/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/25/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/30/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/16/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/25/1998