Committees: H.R.2921 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce11/07/1997 Referred to
06/24/1998 Markup by
07/30/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-661,Part 1
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection11/14/1997 Referred to
04/01/1998 Hearings by
06/17/1998 Markup by
06/17/1998 Reported by
House Judiciary11/07/1997 Referred to
08/04/1998 Markup by
09/10/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-661,Part 2
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property12/19/1997 Referred to
07/31/1998 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/08/1998 Referred to