Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/09/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/09/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/12/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/12/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/12/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/12/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/12/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/13/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/27/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/27/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/28/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/11/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/26/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/26/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/26/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/05/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/05/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/17/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/26/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/01/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/23/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/07/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/14/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/30/1998