Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/08/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/11/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/11/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/25/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/11/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/07/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/15/1998