Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/12/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/11/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/04/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/17/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/24/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/06/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/04/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/11/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/01/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/07/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/09/1998