Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 11/08/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/05/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/13/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/17/1998