Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/30/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/30/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/30/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/30/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/30/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/12/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/21/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/10/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1998