Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/21/1998