Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/04/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/24/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/28/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/28/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/30/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/12/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/12/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/05/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/20/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/20/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/21/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/27/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/30/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/30/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/04/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/05/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/05/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/10/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/10/1998