Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/19/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/31/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/1998