Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/08/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/05/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/11/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/25/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/30/1998