Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/17/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/1998