Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/09/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 11/09/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/25/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/04/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/12/1998