Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 11/09/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/13/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/06/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew