Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/26/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/23/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/15/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/29/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/09/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/09/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/09/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/25/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/09/1998