Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/12/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/12/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/28/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/03/1998