Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/04/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/04/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/13/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/13/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/26/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/26/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/05/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/05/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/19/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/19/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/19/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/19/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/19/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/15/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/06/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/16/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/03/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/12/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/20/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/16/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/11/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/12/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/03/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/09/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew