Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/12/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/27/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 01/27/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 01/27/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/27/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/27/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/27/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/27/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/05/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/05/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/05/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/26/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/04/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/09/1998