Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/05/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/11/1998