Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/13/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/13/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/13/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/12/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/12/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/19/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/31/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/31/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/31/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/01/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/21/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/05/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/18/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/14/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/16/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/21/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/21/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/21/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/21/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 08/04/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/04/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/10/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/28/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/28/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/28/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/28/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/28/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/28/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/01/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/01/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/01/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/01/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/01/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/01/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/01/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/02/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/15/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/15/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/20/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/20/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/20/1998