There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Family Fair Minimum Wage Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the Federal minimum wage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/13/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/27/1998Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (107)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/27/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/03/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/03/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/03/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/12/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/12/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/12/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/12/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/12/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/24/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/27/1998 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections02/13/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3100.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3100. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/1998)

American Family Fair Minimum Wage Act of 1998 - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the Federal minimum wage per hour, beginning on September 1 of the years specified, to: (1) $5.65 in 1998; (2) $6.15 in 1999; (3) $6.65 in 2000; and (4) in 2001 and subsequent fiscal years, $6.65 adjusted to reflect increases in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers.