Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/27/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/03/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/03/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/03/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/11/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/11/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/11/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/25/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/25/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/01/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/01/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/29/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/29/1998