Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/28/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/28/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/28/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/12/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/12/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/12/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/25/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/21/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/21/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/21/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/21/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/21/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/21/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/21/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/15/1998