Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/28/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/28/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/12/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/26/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/23/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/13/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/03/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/04/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/04/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/10/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/1998