Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/28/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/11/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/11/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/24/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/24/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/03/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/09/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/09/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/09/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/09/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/09/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/09/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/16/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/16/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/16/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/16/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/16/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/16/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/16/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/23/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/23/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/23/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/23/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/21/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/04/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/04/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/04/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/04/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/04/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/04/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/04/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/04/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/21/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/23/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/16/1998