There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Venipuncture Seniors Protection Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 4615 of the Balanced Budget Act of 1997 to delay for 18 months the prohibition of payment under the Medicare Program for home health services consisting of venipuncture solely for the purpose of obtaining a blood sample and to require submission of a report on the impact of implementing such section.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
02/11/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
02/11/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H409)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/03/1998Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1998Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1998Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H110-111)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/03/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/26/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/25/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/03/1998 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/04/1998 Referred to
House Commerce02/03/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/11/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3137.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/1998)

Medicare Venipuncture Seniors Protection Act of 1998 - Amends the Balanced Budget Act of 1997 to place an 18-month delay on the prohibition against payment for home health services consisting of venipuncture solely for purposes of obtaining a blood sample. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to study and report to the Congress with respect to the provision of home health services consisting of venipuncture under title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act.

Requires the report on the definition of homebound to include specific legislative recommendations to reduce waste, fraud, and abuse (if any) in the determination of whether an individual is homebound without jeopardizing the Medicare services provided to beneficiaries with serious medical conditions.